Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoni Melchior Fijałkowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1778BornPszczew
4 Jan 180123.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184264.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
27 Jan 184264.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
15 May 184264.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
18 Sep 185678.7AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
5 Oct 186183.7DiedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Melchior Fijałkowski (VIAF: 102160176)
Archbishop Antoni Melchior Fijałkowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858, Page 196
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1856, Page 167
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1860, Page 205
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016