Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franciszek Skarbek von Malczewski

Deceased

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1754Born
10 Jun 178328.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jun 178328.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 181560.9AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
5 Nov 181561.0Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
2 Oct 181863.9AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
18 Apr 181964.5DiedArchbishop-Elect of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Skarbek von Malczewski
Archbishop Franciszek Skarbek von Malczewski (born , died ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanienka
Ordained BishopSte Croix, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 49
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 389, and Page 399
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast