Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Jan Manugiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1754BornRychcice
6 Mar 178530.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 182268.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
27 Sep 182268.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
10 Nov 182268.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
19 Dec 182571.7AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
9 Jul 182672.2InstalledBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
25 Jun 183480.2DiedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Jan Manugiewicz:
Bishop Mikołaj Jan Manugiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,686
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 345, and Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013