Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Iovinus Fridericus Bystrzycki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1737³BornWypychy
1769¹31.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 182183.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
8 Jan 182183.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
11 Jul 182184.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iovinus Fridericus Bystrzycki:
Priest Iovinus Fridericus Bystrzycki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 52.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013