Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wincenty Tymieniecki

Deceased

Bishop of Łódź, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1871Born
6 Jan 189523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
11 Apr 192150.0AppointedBishop of Łódź, Poland
29 Jun 192150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Łódź, Poland
10 Aug 193463.3DiedBishop of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Tymieniecki
Bishop Wincenty Tymieniecki (born , died ) Bishop of Łódź

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiotrków

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast