Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jan Sergiusz Gajek, M.I.C.

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

Priest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

Titular See: (Greek Catholics in Belarus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1949 Born
Aug 1967³18.4EnteredMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
15 Aug 197324.5Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
23 Jun 197425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
1994²44.8AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Sergiusz Gajek (VIAF: 101769163)
Father Jan Sergiusz Gajek M.I.C. (born ) Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁyszkowice, Poland

  • a priest for years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast