Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walenty Maciej Tomaszewski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1781BornŁęczyca
22 Apr 180423.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 183655.8AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
15 Jan 183755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
18 Jan 185169.9DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Walenty Maciej Tomaszewski:
Bishop Walenty Maciej Tomaszewski (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,196
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014