Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janusz Marian Danecki, O.F.M. Conv.

Auxiliary Bishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul

Titular Bishop of Regiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1951 BornSochaczew, Poland
5 Sep 197119.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Dec 197524.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Jun 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
25 Feb 201563.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
25 Feb 201563.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiae
1 May 201563.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiae

MicroData Summary for Janusz Marian Danecki:
Bishop Janusz Marian Danecki O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Campo Grande

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Campo Grande.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2015
  • mn: CB, 25 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 5 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 24 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015