Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Czeslaw Falkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Łomża


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1887BornVarsavia
26 Jul 191022.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 194961.2AppointedBishop of Łomża, Poland
8 May 194961.4Ordained BishopBishop of Łomża, Poland
25 Aug 196981.7DiedBishop of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Czeslaw Falkowski:
Bishop Czeslaw Falkowski (born , died ) Bishop of Łomża

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Mar 2014