Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wladyslaw Miziolek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Titular Bishop of Praesidium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1914BornKompina
23 Jun 194025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
19 Feb 196954.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
19 Feb 196954.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Praesidium
25 Mar 196954.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praesidium
1 Feb 199277.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
12 May 200085.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wladyslaw Miziolek:
Bishop Wladyslaw Miziolek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 9 Dec 2013