Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Jacek Święcicki, O.C.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
20 Mar 165136.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
20 Mar 165136.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
Apr 1651²36.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
8 Feb 167762.1AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
26 Oct 169681.8DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Jacek Święcicki (VIAF: 163923552)
Bishop Stanisław Jacek Święcicki O.C.S.A. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSwiecice, Diocese of Warszawa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Varniai
Death PlaceSkierbieszów, Diocese of Chełm

  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 39
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,464

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast