Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Tomasz Osial

Auxiliary Bishop of Łowicz, Poland

Titular Bishop of Cediae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1970 Born
25 May 199524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Łowicz, Poland
24 Dec 201545.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łowicz, Poland
24 Dec 201545.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cediae
4 Feb 201645.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cediae

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Tomasz Osial
Bishop Wojciech Tomasz Osial (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łowicz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁowicz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Łowicz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 3 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 17 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,837

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast