Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Ignacy Przeździecki

Deceased

Bishop of Siedlce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1873Born
22 Dec 189522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
24 Sep 191845.6AppointedBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
17 Nov 191845.7Ordained BishopBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
1 Dec 191845.7InstalledBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
9 May 193966.2DiedBishop of Siedlce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Ignacy Przeździecki
Bishop Henryk Ignacy Przeździecki (born , died ) Bishop of Siedlce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarszawa

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Oct 2018

Quantcast