Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Czesław Sokołowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland

Titular Bishop of Pentacomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1877Born
11 Aug 190124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
28 Sep 191942.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
4 Oct 191942.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
4 Oct 191942.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
27 Jun 194062.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Siedlce, Poland
4 Jul 194668.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Siedlce, Poland
11 Nov 195174.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Czesław Sokołowski
Bishop Czesław Sokołowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Siedlce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarszawa

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast