Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Henryk Lubicz Choromański

Deceased

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1769BornRiedzwiedzk
1792¹22.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 182859.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
15 Dec 182859.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
8 Feb 182959.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
21 Nov 183667.0AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
15 Jan 183767.1InstalledArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
21 Feb 183868.2DiedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Henryk Lubicz Choromański (VIAF: 303226017)
Archbishop Stanisław Henryk Lubicz Choromański (born , died ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 59, and Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016