Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Chmielewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1767³Born
21 Dec 179426.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 183769.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
2 Oct 183769.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
19 Nov 183769.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
30 Jul 1844³76.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Chmielewski
Bishop Tomasz Chmielewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChmielowo

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast