Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Grimani

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1461Born
20 Sep 149332.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149332.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
3 Jul 149534.3AppointedAdministrator of Nicosia, Cyprus
4 Sep 149534.5ResignedAdministrator of Nicosia, Cyprus
13 Sep 149736.5SelectedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
13 Feb 149836.9ConfirmedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
21 Mar 149837.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 149837.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
25 Apr 149837.1Ordained BishopPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
25 Dec 150342.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
22 Sep 150847.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
3 Jun 150948.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
20 Jan 151149.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 May 151453.2AppointedAdministrator of Urbino, Italy
1517²55.8AppointedAdministrator of Ceneda, Italy
19 Jan 151755.9ResignedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
28 Mar 152059.1ResignedAdministrator of Ceneda, Italy
17 Jul 152362.4ResignedAdministrator of Urbino, Italy
26 Aug 152362.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Grimani (VIAF: 67314831)
Domenico Cardinal Grimani (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Nicolas - Palais du Cardinal Grimani, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceS. Marco Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Ss. Giovanni e Paolo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Francesco della Vigna, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
  • a cardinal for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323, and Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1498, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast