Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Gobbato, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Taunggyi, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1912Born
22 Sep 193422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
21 Mar 196148.8AppointedBishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
21 May 196149.0Ordained BishopBishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
18 Dec 198977.5RetiredBishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
6 Aug 199987.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Taunggyi, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Gobbato
Bishop John Baptist Gobbato P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Taunggyi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSernaglia della Battaglia, Italy

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast