Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marino Cardinal Grimani

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1488¹BornVenice
16 Aug 150820.6AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
19 Jan 151729.0AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
3 May 152739.3Elevated to Cardinal
7 Feb 152840.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
18 Apr 152941.3ResignedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
18 Dec 153144.0AppointedAdministrator of Ceneda, Italy
12 Nov 153244.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
Jul 1533³45.5AppointedAdministrator of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
19 Apr 153446.3AppointedAdministrator of Città di Castello, Italy
13 Nov 153446.9AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
20 Nov 153446.9ResignedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
17 Sep 153547.7AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
1537²49.0ResignedAdministrator of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
4 Mar 153951.2ResignedAdministrator of Città di Castello, Italy
4 Aug 153951.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
20 Feb 154052.1ResignedAdministrator of Ceneda, Italy
13 Mar 154153.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
24 Sep 154355.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Jan 154557.1AppointedAdministrator of Ceneda, Italy
23 Mar 154557.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
28 Sep 154658.7DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Grimani:
Cardinal Marino Grimani (died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

  • a cardinal for 19.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 May 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 162, and Page 177
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013