Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Antonino Squarcina, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1780BornVicenza
4 Jun 180322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Jun 182847.9SelectedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
15 Dec 182848.4ConfirmedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
28 Dec 182848.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
27 Jan 184261.5AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
22 Dec 185171.4DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Antonino Squarcina:
Bishop Bernardo Antonino Squarcina O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 59, and Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014