Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Bucciol

Bishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1946 BornMotta di Livenza, Italy
12 Sep 197125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
21 Jan 200457.5AppointedBishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Bahia, Brazil
17 Apr 200457.8Ordained BishopBishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Bahia, Brazil
18 Apr 200457.8InstalledBishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Armando Bucciol:
Bishop Armando Bucciol (born ) Bishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Livramento de Nossa Senhora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,574

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014