Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Agazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornVenezia
23 Dec 167327.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 167428.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 169246.0AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
20 Jan 169246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
28 Mar 171064.2DiedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Agazzi:
Bishop Marcantonio Agazzi (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Ceneda

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015