Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Zaffonato

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Udine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1899BornMagrè di Schio
16 Jul 192222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
6 Feb 194444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elatea
23 Apr 194444.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elatea
27 Sep 194546.0AppointedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
31 Jan 195656.4AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
29 Sep 197273.0ResignedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
28 Aug 198888.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Zaffonato:
Archbishop Giuseppe Zaffonato (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Udine

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015