Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Leoni

Deceased

Bishop of Verona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1637BornVenezia
25 Sep 166730.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 166730.6AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
20 Nov 166730.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
26 Nov 169154.6AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
17 Dec 169760.7DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Leoni:
Bishop Pietro Leoni (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153, and Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015