Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Dal Cin

Prelate of Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1965 Born
7 Dec 199025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
20 May 201752.3AppointedPrelate of Loreto, Italy
9 Jul 201752.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Loreto, Italy
2 Sep 201752.6InstalledPrelate of Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Dal Cin
Archbishop Fabio Dal Cin (born ) Prelate of Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVittorio Veneto, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
Ordained PriestSarmede, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vittorio Veneto, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Territorial Prelature of Loreto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 30 May 2017
  • c2: CB, 26 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,485
  • c1/loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast