Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michele Cardinal della Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511¹Born
7 Feb 154736.0AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
30 May 154736.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
Oct 1547³36.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1550²39.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
25 Mar 155645.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
12 Aug 156857.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
12 Dec 158372.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 158675.1DiedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele della Torre (VIAF: 72566100)
Michele Cardinal della Torre (born 1511, died ) Bishop of Ceneda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUdine
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCeneda, Diocese of Ceneda
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Ceneda, Diocese of Ceneda

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 289
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 9
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,544

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast