Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Caron

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Genova, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1848Born
28 Jul 187224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
25 Aug 190557.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ceneda, Italy
25 Aug 190557.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
1 Oct 190557.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
8 Jan 190859.5SucceededBishop of Ceneda, Italy
29 Apr 191263.8AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
22 Jan 191566.6ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
22 Jan 191566.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
29 Jan 192778.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Caron
Archbishop Andrea Caron (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosÓ de Bassano Veneto

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 66
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1905, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018