Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Minuccio Minucci

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1551Born
9 Mar 158736.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 159645.0AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
10 Mar 159645.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
7 Mar 160453.1DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Minuccio Minucci (VIAF: 44425595)
Archbishop Minuccio Minucci (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerravalle, Diocese of Ceneda, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Girolamo degli Illirici, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMünchen

  • a priest for 16.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c12: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 207
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 274
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast