Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ovidio Poletto

Bishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1935 Born
6 Jul 195823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
16 Sep 200065.4AppointedBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
11 Nov 200065.6Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
8 Dec 200065.6InstalledBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
25 Feb 201175.9RetiredBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ovidio Poletto
Bishop Ovidio Poletto (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaneva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast