Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Da Ponte

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1695BornVenezia
7 Sep 172126.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 173944.3AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
20 Dec 173944.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
9 Jul 176872.8DiedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Da Ponte:
Bishop Lorenzo Da Ponte (born , died ) Bishop of Ceneda

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013