Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista del Giudice

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹Born
28 Nov 164437.9AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
4 Dec 164437.9Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
24 Jan 166659.0DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista del Giudice
Bishop Giambattista del Giudice (born 1607, died ) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConegliano, Diocese of Ceneda, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Marco, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceOrsera, Diocese of Poreč (Parenzo)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Poreč, Diocese of Poreč (Parenzo)

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 33
  • b/ob/c2: AT, 27 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast