Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Primo Calvo y López

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1808BornBurgo de Osma, Spain
14 Nov 186153.4SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
23 Dec 186153.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
6 Apr 186253.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
7 Oct 186860.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Primo Calvo y López:
Bishop Primo Calvo y López (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 169, Number 929

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015