Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás de la Torre Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹Born
13 Sep 164960.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
19 Feb 165162.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
4 Jul 165364.5DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás de la Torre Muñoz
Bishop Nicolás de la Torre Muñoz (born 1589, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,841
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast