Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Valentín de la Asunción (Manuel) Zubizarreta y Unamunsaga, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1862Born
18 Dec 188624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
25 May 191451.5AppointedBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
8 Nov 191452.0Ordained BishopBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
3 Jan 191653.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cienfuegos, Cuba
24 Feb 192259.3AppointedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
30 Mar 192562.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
30 Mar 192562.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cienfuegos, Cuba
28 Jun 192562.6InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
2 Jan 193673.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Cienfuegos, Cuba
26 Feb 194885.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Valentín de la Asunción (Manuel) Zubizarreta y Unamunsaga
Archbishop Valentín de la Asunción (Manuel) Zubizarreta y Unamunsaga O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarquina Echeverria

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 61
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast