Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Antonio María Claret y Clará, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1807BornSallent, Spain
13 Jun 183527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
18 Oct 184941.8SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
20 May 185042.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
6 Oct 185042.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
20 Jul 185951.5ResignedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
13 Jul 186052.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
24 Oct 187062.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba
25 Feb 1934Beatified
7 May 1950Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Antonio María Claret y Clará:
Archbishop St. Antonio María Claret y Clará C.M.F. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 314, and Page 560
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 159, Number 872

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015