Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Riu Anglés

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Camagüey

Titular Bishop of Lari Castellum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1901BornSan Andrés de Palomar, Spain
2 Feb 192423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
11 Dec 194847.9AppointedBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
6 Mar 194948.1Ordained BishopBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
10 Sep 196463.6ResignedBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
10 Sep 196463.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lari Castellum
28 Nov 197170.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Camagüey, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Carlos Riu Anglés:
Bishop Carlos Riu Anglés (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Camagüey

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1972
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 14
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015