Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspar Cardinal de Molina y Oviedo, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1679BornMérida, Spain
15 Aug 169516.6ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
11 Sep 173051.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
24 Feb 173152.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
18 Jun 173152.4AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
5 May 173455.3AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
20 Dec 173758.9Elevated to Cardinal
30 Aug 174465.6DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar de Molina y Oviedo:
Gaspar Cardinal de Molina y Oviedo O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 49, Number 205
  • bd: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 10
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1737
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115, and Page 240
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016