Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Díaz Vara y Calderón

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621²Born
14 Dec 167150.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
4 Sep 167251.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
13 Mar 167655.1DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Díaz Vara y Calderón
Bishop Gabriel Díaz Vara y Calderón (born 1621, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 208, Number 1,301
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast