Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ponce y Carrasco

Deceased

Bishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1706¹Born
28 Nov 174640.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba
28 Nov 174640.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
3 Dec 174741.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
20 Dec 176256.9AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
28 Oct 177569.8DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ponce y Carrasco
Bishop Pedro Ponce y Carrasco (born 1706, died ) Bishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,456
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,639
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 65, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 65, Number 305
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast