Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Agustín Morell de Santa Cruz y Lora

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1694BornSantiago de los Caballeros
24 Apr 171621.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
14 Aug 174954.7SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
20 Oct 174954.8ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
13 Sep 175055.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
30 Mar 175358.3SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
28 May 175358.4ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
30 Dec 176874.0DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Pedro Agustín Morell de Santa Cruz y Lora:
Bishop Pedro Agustín Morell de Santa Cruz y Lora (born Dec 1694, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,457
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 240, and Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015