Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquín de Osés y Alzúa y Caparacio

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1755Born
3 Dec 179237.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
24 Nov 179338.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
24 Nov 180348.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
7 Feb 182367.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Joaquín de Osés y Alzúa y Caparacio
Archbishop Joaquín de Osés y Alzúa y Caparacio (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalbarra, Spain

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,841
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,733
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 111, Number 580
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast