Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Laso de la Vega y Cansino, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1675BornCarmona, Spain
19 Nov 173156.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
20 Apr 173256.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
19 Nov 175277.1DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for José Laso de la Vega y Cansino:
Bishop José Laso de la Vega y Cansino O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 50, Number 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015