Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José María Cardinal Cos y Macho

Deceased

Archbishop of Valladolid, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1838Born
Sep 1862³24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mondoñedo, Spain
10 Jun 188647.8AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
12 Sep 188648.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
14 Feb 188950.5AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
11 Jul 189253.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Madrid, Spain
18 Apr 190162.6AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
24 Apr 190162.7InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
27 Nov 191173.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 191274.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
17 Dec 191981.3DiedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José María Cos y Macho (VIAF: 88752424)
José María Cardinal Cos y Macho (born , died ) Archbishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerán y Solones, Diocese of Santander
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oviedo, Diocese of Oviedo
Death PlaceValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 314, and Page 373
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 386, and Page 580
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 42
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017