Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Evelino Hurtado de Compostela (Vélez)

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornSantiago de Compostela, Spain
4 Apr 168547.2SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
4 Jun 168547.4ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
19 Aug 168547.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
29 Aug 170466.6DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Evelino Hurtado de Compostela (Vélez):
Bishop Diego Evelino Hurtado de Compostela (Vélez) (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 226, Number 1,403
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015