Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Sáenz de Urturi y Crespo, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

Titular Archbishop of Bostra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1842Born
1 Jun 189149.4AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
20 Sep 189149.7Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
21 May 189452.3AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
8 Nov 189452.8InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
27 Apr 189957.3ResignedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
31 May 189957.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
13 Dec 190361.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Francisco Sáenz de Urturi y Crespo
Archbishop Francisco Sáenz de Urturi y Crespo O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArlucea, Diocese of Vitoria, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vitoria, Diocese of Vitoria, Spain

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 154, and Page 314
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 433
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017