Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrique Pérez Serantes

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1883Born
10 Sep 191026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
24 Feb 192238.2AppointedBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
13 Aug 192238.7Ordained BishopBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
2 Sep 192238.7InstalledBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
11 Dec 194865.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
18 Apr 196884.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Enrique Pérez Serantes
Archbishop Enrique Pérez Serantes (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuy, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cienfuegos, Diocese of Cienfuegos

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1922, Number 48
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast