Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Claro Meurice Estiu

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1932BornSan Luis
26 Jun 195523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
1 Jul 196735.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba
1 Jul 196735.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Teglata in Numidia
30 Aug 196735.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teglata in Numidia
4 Jul 197038.3AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
10 Feb 200774.9RetiredArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
21 Jul 201179.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Pedro Claro Meurice Estiu
Archbishop Pedro Claro Meurice Estiu (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2007
  • d: CB, 21 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Dec 2016