Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan (Johannes) de Witte Hoos (Ubite), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1475Born
15 May 151438.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Selymbria
11 Feb 151640.5AppointedBishop of Baracoa (All Cuba) (Nuestra Señora de la Asunción de Baracoa), Cuba
28 Apr 152246.7AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
4 Apr 152549.6ResignedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
18 Sep 154065.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Juan (Johannes) de Witte Hoos (Ubite)
Bishop Juan (Johannes) de Witte Hoos (Ubite) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruges
Death PlaceBruges
Buried Place (Original)Santo Domingo, Church, Bruges

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 30, Number 106
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 297, and Page 182
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 13*
  • b: Episcopologio de la Iglesia Católica en Cuba, 2 Jan 2022
  • b: CB, 2 Jan 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022