Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gabriel Diaz Ruiz

Bishop of Ciego de Ávila, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1960 Born
5 Aug 198928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Camagüey, Cuba
8 Jul 201756.6AppointedBishop of Ciego de Ávila, Cuba
30 Sep 201756.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ciego de Ávila, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Juan Gabriel Diaz Ruiz
Bishop Juan Gabriel Diaz Ruiz (born ) Bishop of Ciego de Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCéspedes, Diocese of Camagüey
Ordained PriestLa Soledad, Church, Camagüey, Diocese of Camagüey
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciego de Ávila, Diocese of Ciego de Ávila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciego de Ávila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2017
  • bp/c1: CB, 8 Jul 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Jul 2017
  • c2+: CB, 1 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 2 Oct 2017