Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Montiel

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateEventTitle
14 May 1655AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
16 Jul 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
30 Aug 1656InstalledBishop of Santiago de Cuba
23 Dec 1657DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Juan de Montiel:
Bishop Juan de Montiel (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 206
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 186, Number 1,162
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015